EP1903792 - Display Apparatus and Broadcasting Signal Display Method Thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Jin-su Shinyoung Czerny Apt. 524 90 Yangjae 1-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07113178.3 | 26.07.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | KR20060092683 | 25.09.2006 Original published format: KR 20060092683 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1903792 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1903792 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N5/44 (KR);
H04H60/16 (EP,US);
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/4314 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/454 (EP,US);
H04N21/4751 (EP,US);
H04N21/4755 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (KR);
H04H20/30 (EP,US);
H04H2201/80 (EP,US);
H04H60/46 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/35] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung und Verfahren zur Anzeige von Rundfunksignalen dafür | [2008/13] | English: | Display Apparatus and Broadcasting Signal Display Method Thereof | [2008/13] | French: | Appareil d'affichage et son procédé d'affichage de signal de diffusion | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002059588 (HUBER THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0028] , [0036] *; | [X]US2004168121 (MATZ WILLIAM R [US]) [X] 1-19 * paragraph [0141]; figures 18,22 * * paragraphs [0012] - [0016] - [0070] , [0078] , [0089]; figure 16 *; | [A]US2005060740 (STECYK POLLY [US]) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [A]US6922843 (HERRINGTON W BENJAMIN [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * figure 18a *; | [X]US2006136962 (MASAKI YASUO [JP]) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0012] , [0036] , [0055]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO2006093739 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |