EP1882612 - Interior trim fastener system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/05] | Interior Trim Fastener System | ||
[2009/51] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newfrey LLC 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [2008/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Slobodecki, Jeffrey A. 1179 Wales Center Road Wales, MI 48027 / US | 02 /
Benedetti, Steven M. 15010 Alma Drive Sterling Heights, MI 48313 / US | 03 /
Fischer, Charles K. 6173 Wildcat Road Grant Township, MI 48032 / US | [2008/05] | Representative(s) | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al haarpatent Patentanwälte Krämer Meyer Goethestraße 2 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | Haar, Lucas Heinz Jörn, et al Patentanwälte Haar & Schwarz-Haar Lessingstrasse 3 61231 Bad Nauheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07113269.0 | 26.07.2007 | [2008/05] | Priority number, date | US20060496008 | 28.07.2006 Original published format: US 496008 | [2008/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1882612 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1882612 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/02, B60J3/02 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
B60R13/0206 (EP,US);
B60J3/0217 (EP,US);
Y10T24/30 (EP,US);
Y10T24/307 (EP,US);
Y10T24/309 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/48] |
Former [2008/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Befestigungssystem für eine Innenverkleidung | [2008/05] | English: | Interior trim fastener system | [2009/51] | French: | Système d'attache de garniture intérieure | [2008/05] |
Former [2008/05] | Interior Trim Fastener System | Examination procedure | 25.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/18] | 29.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6113253 (YOSHII TAKANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-13,15-24,26-28,31,32 * figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 25; | [X]US6179366 (HANSZ THOMAS J [US]) [X] 1-4,10,16,18-22,27,28,31,32 * figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP1510702 (NEWFREY LLC [US]) [A] 17* paragraph [0002] *; | [XY]FR2880316 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,8,9,16 * figures 1-4 * [Y] 25 |