EP1905770 - A process for the preparation of olmesartan medoxomil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/14] | A process for the preparation of phenyltetrazole compounds | ||
[2012/20] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dipharma Francis S.r.l. Via Bissone, 5 20021 Baranzate (MI) / IT | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Razzetti, Gabriele Via G. Puccini, 60 20099, SESTO S. GIOVANNI / IT | 02 /
Colombo, Lino Viale Bligny, 43 27100, PAVIA / IT | 03 /
Rota, Paola Via G. Marconi, 1 20078, SAN COLOMBANO AL LAMBRO / IT | 04 /
Allegrini, Pietro Via Gorizia, 1 20097, SAN DONATO MILANESE / IT | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07113477.9 | 31.07.2007 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | IT2006MI01848 | 27.09.2006 Original published format: IT MI20061848 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1905770 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/14, C07D403/10 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D233/90 (EP,US);
C07D405/10 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/14] | C07D405/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Olmesartanmedoxomil | [2012/20] | English: | A process for the preparation of olmesartan medoxomil | [2012/20] | French: | Procédé de préparation de l'olmésartan médoxomil | [2012/20] |
Former [2008/14] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Phenyltetrazolverbindungen | ||
Former [2008/14] | A process for the preparation of phenyltetrazole compounds | ||
Former [2008/14] | Procédé de préparation de composés de phenyltétrazole | Examination procedure | 08.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 29.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 07.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN1164587C ; | CN1164587C [ ] (ZHEJIANG ACADEMY OF METAL SCIE [CN]); | [X]EP1555260 (DIPHARMA SPA [IT]) [X] 11 * page 6, line 17 - line 18; example 1 *; | [PX]WO2006125592 (LEK PHARMACEUTICALS [SI], et al) [PX] 11 * claim 16 *; | [PX]WO2007039117 (KRKA D D NOVO MESTO [SI], et al) [PX] 11 * claim 20; compound VIII *; | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (2003), Database accession no. 2003:759274, XP002464193 [X] 11 * RN number : 685091-51-4 * | [X] - "Process for preparing Aomeishatan", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, Database accession no. 2003-211802[21], XP002464194 & CN1164587C C 20040901 (ZHEJIANG METALLURGY INST) [X] 1-11 * abstract * | Examination | WO2006073518 | - NORMAN D P G ET AL, "Nucleophilic Aromatic Substitution Reactions of Novel 5-(2-Methoxyphenyl)tetrazole Derivatives with Organolithium Reagents", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON.; US, (19990101), vol. 64, doi:10.1021/JO991236S, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 9301 - 9306, XP002329820 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo991236s | by applicant | WO2005014560 |