EP1890443 - System and method for implementing a multi-radio wireless relay network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/08] | System and method for implementing a multi-radio wireless network | ||
[2012/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Wei-Peng 3707 Poinciana Drive No. 27 Santa Clara, CA 95051-2026 / US | 02 /
Zhu, Chenxi 6 Graceland Street Gaithersburg, MD 20878-7304 / US | 03 /
Agre, Jonathan R. 800 Brighton Knolls Drive Brinklow, MD 20862-9723 / US | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Wilding, Frances Ward, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2008/08] | Wilding, Frances Ward, et al Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07113532.1 | 31.07.2007 | [2008/08] | Priority number, date | US20060822861 | 18.08.2006 Original published format: US 822861 | US20070668135 | 29.01.2007 Original published format: US 668135 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1890443 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1890443 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1890443 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/26, // H04W84/04 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
H04W16/26 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/2606 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/15507 (KR);
H04W84/047 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/08] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/36] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Implementierung eines drahtlosen Relaisnetzwerks mit mehreren Funkstationen | [2012/07] | English: | System and method for implementing a multi-radio wireless relay network | [2012/07] | French: | Système et procédé de mise en oeuvre d'un réseau de relais sans fil multi-radio | [2012/07] |
Former [2008/08] | System und Verfahren zur Implementierung eines drahtlosen Netzwerks mit mehreren Funkstationen | ||
Former [2008/08] | System and method for implementing a multi-radio wireless network | ||
Former [2008/08] | Système et procédé de mise en oeuvre d'un réseau sans fil multi-radio | Examination procedure | 29.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 05.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.08.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9524783 (ALLEN TELECOM GROUP INC [US]) [X] 1,10,19,20 * abstract * * figures 1,2,4 * * page 7, line 2 - page 8, line 18 * * page 24, line 4 - page 25, line 20 * * page 26, line 35 - page 27, line 28 * [I] 2-9,11-18; | [XI]EP1501215 (TELEFONICA SA [ES]) [X] 1,10,19,20 * abstract * * figures 1,3,5 * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0037] * [I] 2-9,11-18; | [XI]US2006098614 (MOON SANG-JUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,10,19,20 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0038] * [I] 2-9,11-18; | [XP]EP1804442 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1,10,19,20 * abstract * * figures 3,15 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0025] ** paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0102] *; | [XI] - PABST ET AL, "Wireless World Research Forum: Relay-Based Deployment Concepts for Wireless and Mobile Broadband Radio", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, (200409), pages 80 - 89, XP002609720 [X] 1,10,19,20 * abstract * * figure 2 * * Section "Multihop Operation" starting on page 82 * [I] 2-9,11-18 |