EP1884820 - Control system and control method for controlling optical modulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/06] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doi, Kenji c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/06] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07113681.6 | 02.08.2007 | [2008/06] | Priority number, date | JP20060211184 | 02.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006211184 | [2008/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1884820 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1884820 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/01 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
G02F1/0123 (EP,US);
G02F1/0327 (EP,US);
G02F2203/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/36] |
Former [2008/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Steuerung eines optischen Modulators | [2008/06] | English: | Control system and control method for controlling optical modulator | [2008/06] | French: | Système de contrôle et procédé de contrôle de modulateur optique | [2008/06] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 06.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/53] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09211400 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [X] 1,15 * abstract *; | [XY]US5900621 (NAGAKUBO YASUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-17,20-24 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5,18,19; | [YA]US6317249 (NAKAMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4,5,18,19 * figures 2,3 * * and the corresponding text passages * [A] 1-24; | [A]US2004190103 (FUJITA TAKAHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * figure 1 ** and the corresponding text passages * |