EP2023674 - Method for mobility administration of terminals in mobile networks, mobile network and mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Revocation of patent | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schweizerische Bundesbahnen SBB Generalsekretariat-Konzernrecht Hochschulstrasse 6 3000 Bern 65 / CH | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baiker, Stefan Peter Ochs-Strasse 11 CH-4059, Basel / CH | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Rutz & Partner Alpenstrasse 14 Postfach 7627 6302 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Rutz & Partner Alpenstrasse 14, Postfach 4627 6304 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2009/07] | Rutz & Partner Alpenstrasse 14, Postfach 4627 6304 Zug / CH | Application number, filing date | 07113889.5 | 06.08.2007 | [2009/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2023674 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2023674 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
H04W36/0058 (EP,US);
H04W28/06 (EP);
H04W28/26 (EP);
H04W4/08 (EP);
H04W60/00 (EP);
H04W8/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Mobilitätsverwaltung von Endgeräten in Mobilfunknetzen, Mobilfunknetz und Mobilendgerät | [2009/07] | English: | Method for mobility administration of terminals in mobile networks, mobile network and mobile terminal | [2009/07] | French: | Procédé de traitement de la mobilité de terminaux dans des réseaux hertziens mobiles, réseau hertzien mobile et terminal mobile | [2009/07] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 09.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.12.2012
17.01.2013
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/42] |
Former [2015/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.12.2012
17.01.2013
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.12.2012
17.01.2013
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE Opponents representative Moyaerts, Laurent N. Siemens AG CT IP RL Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.12.2012
Siemens AG Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | 04.02.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.08.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.04.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.04.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.01.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/19] | 02.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 09.06.2015 | Appeal received No. T0983/15 | 12.08.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.01.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 06.05.2015 | Appeal received No. T0983/15 | 01.08.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.01.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 28.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.02.2020 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 05.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 06.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.02.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 04.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2007 | CY | 28.03.2012 | CZ | 28.03.2012 | DK | 28.03.2012 | EE | 28.03.2012 | FI | 28.03.2012 | LT | 28.03.2012 | LV | 28.03.2012 | MT | 28.03.2012 | NL | 28.03.2012 | PL | 28.03.2012 | PT | 28.03.2012 | RO | 28.03.2012 | SE | 28.03.2012 | SI | 28.03.2012 | SK | 28.03.2012 | TR | 28.03.2012 | BG | 28.06.2012 | GR | 29.06.2012 | ES | 09.07.2012 | IS | 28.07.2012 | IE | 06.08.2012 | LU | 06.08.2012 | BE | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
IE | 06.08.2012 | ||
LU | 06.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
TR | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
IE | 06.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
MT | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
IE | 06.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
DK | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
NL | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
BG | 28.06.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
ES | 09.07.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
IE | 06.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
SK | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
CZ | 28.03.2012 | ||
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
PL | 28.03.2012 | ||
RO | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
SI | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
IS | 28.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
EE | 28.03.2012 | ||
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
SE | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 28.03.2012 | |
FI | 28.03.2012 | ||
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
LV | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 28.03.2012 | |
LT | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 28.03.2012 | |
GR | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 28.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0566548 (TELEVERKET [SE]); | [Y]DE19903909 (DELPHI 2 CREATIVE TECH GMBH [DE]); | [XY]EP1058473 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [YA]WO2004040933 (DOCOMO COMM LAB EUROPE GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]US2006068802 (BENCO DAVID S [US], et al); | [A]EP1657942 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); |