EP1905510 - Fuel cell system and corresponding operating method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. Eberspächer GmbH & Co. KG Eberspächerstrasse 24 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kienzle, Birgit Am Zundeltor 3 89073 Ulm / DE | 02 /
Emelianov, Petr Christophplatz 10 74076 Heilbronn / DE | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Bongen, Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07113900.0 | 07.08.2007 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | DE20061046676 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006046676 | [2008/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1905510 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1905510 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | [2010/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1905510 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/90, B01J38/12, C01B3/38, H01M8/04, H01M8/06 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
H01M8/04373 (EP);
B01J23/90 (EP);
C01B3/386 (EP);
H01M8/04097 (EP);
H01M8/04776 (EP);
H01M8/0618 (EP);
B01J38/12 (EP);
C01B2203/0261 (EP);
C01B2203/066 (EP);
C01B2203/1235 (EP);
C01B2203/1276 (EP);
C01B2203/1614 (EP);
C01B2203/169 (EP);
H01M2250/20 (EP);
H01M8/04007 (EP);
H01M8/04791 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P20/52 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/14] | B01J23/90, B01J38/12, H01M8/04, H01M8/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/41] |
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Brennstoffzellensystem und zugehöriges Betriebsverfahren | [2008/14] | English: | Fuel cell system and corresponding operating method | [2008/14] | French: | Système de piles à combustible et son procédé de fonctionnement | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 11.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 07.08.2011 | FR | 31.08.2011 | [2012/37] |
Former [2012/36] | GB | 07.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1513207 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 6, paragraph 42 * * figure 1 ** page 16, paragraph 123 - paragraph 125 *; | [A]EP1557896 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, paragraph 9 * * page 3, paragraphs 12,19 * * page 4, paragraph 25 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102004059647 (WEBASTO AG FAHRZEUGTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, paragraphs 9,11 * * page 3, paragraph 14 * * page 3, paragraph 19 * |