EP1892115 - Method of forming a phase change ink image on a self-laminating recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Océ-Technologies B.V. St. Urbanusweg 43 5914 CA Venlo / NL | [2009/51] |
Former [2008/09] | For all designated states Océ-Technologies B.V. St. Urbanusweg 43 5914 CC Venlo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willems, Guido G. Ruijsstraat 122 5921 VS, Venlo / NL | 02 /
Rooijakkers, Johannes P.J.C. Akelei 4 5941 AX, Velden / NL | 03 /
Sturme, Rudolf A.H.M. Akelei 6 5993 HG, Maasbree / NL | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | van Meeteren, Arend Anthonie Océ-Technologies B.V. Corporate Patents Postbus 101 5900 MA Venlo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | van Meeteren, Arend Anthonie Océ-Technologies B.V. Corporate Patents Postbus 101 5900 MA Venlo / NL | Application number, filing date | 07113964.6 | 07.08.2007 | [2008/09] | Priority number, date | EP20060119292 | 22.08.2006 Original published format: EP 06119292 | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1892115 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1892115 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41M7/00 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
B41M7/0027 (EP);
B41M7/009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsverfahren, das eine Phasenaustauschtinte auf einem selbstlaminierenden Aufzeichnungsmedium verwendet | [2008/09] | English: | Method of forming a phase change ink image on a self-laminating recording medium | [2008/09] | French: | Procédé de formation d'image utilisant une encre à changement de phase sur un matériau auto-laminant | [2008/09] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 25.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.12.2009 | BE | 23.12.2009 | CY | 23.12.2009 | CZ | 23.12.2009 | DK | 23.12.2009 | EE | 23.12.2009 | FI | 23.12.2009 | IT | 23.12.2009 | LT | 23.12.2009 | LV | 23.12.2009 | MT | 23.12.2009 | PL | 23.12.2009 | RO | 23.12.2009 | SE | 23.12.2009 | SI | 23.12.2009 | SK | 23.12.2009 | TR | 23.12.2009 | BG | 23.03.2010 | GR | 24.03.2010 | ES | 03.04.2010 | IS | 23.04.2010 | PT | 23.04.2010 | HU | 24.06.2010 | IE | 07.08.2010 | LU | 07.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
HU | 24.06.2010 | ||
IE | 07.08.2010 | ||
LU | 07.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
HU | 24.06.2010 | ||
IE | 07.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
IE | 07.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | FI | 23.12.2009 | |
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4724025 (NISHIKAWA MASAJI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * claim 1 ** column 5, lines 6-11 *; | [A]EP0518621 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [A] 1-9 * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 * * column 1, lines 1-27 *; | [AD]US6497480 (WEXLER ALLAN [US]) [AD] 1-9 * claim - * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0037] * | by applicant | EP1067157 | US6497480 | US2003234841 | US6811253 | US6905203 | WO2006EP62614 |