EP2026030 - Method and device for detecting a fire shot event in a weapon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAAB AB 581 88 Linköping / SE | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chedid, Michel Mellangatan 49 C JÖNKÖPING 554 51 / SE | 02 /
Forselius, Mats Fortunagatan 17 JÖNKÖPING 553 23 / SE | 03 /
Dahlqvist, Stefan Sjöbergs Säteri TENHULT 560 27 / SE | 04 /
Isaksson, Anders Smedstorp 108 ULRICEHAMN 523 91 / SE | 05 /
Emricson, Ingemar Stavhoppsvägen 44 BANKERYD 564 34 / SE | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Norberg, Charlotte Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07114404.2 | 16.08.2007 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2026030 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F41G3/26 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
F41G3/2655 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erkennung eines Abschussereignisses bei einer Waffe | [2009/08] | English: | Method and device for detecting a fire shot event in a weapon | [2009/08] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour détecter un événement de coup de feu dans une arme | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/50] | 09.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3938262 (DYE RICHARD A, et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4768958 (SUDDABY PETER [GB]) [Y] 2,7,9,10,12 * column 1, lines 5-30 *; | [Y]EP0302663 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [Y] 4-6 * abstract * * claim 1 * * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 12 *; | [A]US2004036602 (LERG GEORGE H [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract ** paragraphs [0062] - [0066] *; | [XAY]WO2004070309 (TORMA MIKAEL [HU]) [X] 1,3,8,11,13,14,16,17 * figures 1,2 * * abstract * * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 10 * * page 7, lines 4-28 * [A] 15 [Y] 2,4-7,9,10,12 | Examination | US4830617 | US5605461 | GB2397128 | DE102005033359 |