EP1895687 - Fault location in meshed networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vila, Gérard Centre de Villarceaux 91625, NOZAY / FR | 02 /
Khalfallah, Sabry 2-4 rue de Reims 75014, PARIS / FR | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Shamsaei Far, Hassan, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Patent Business Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Shamsaei Far, Hassan, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2008/10] | Shamsaei Far, Hassan, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07114859.7 | 23.08.2007 | [2008/10] | Priority number, date | FR20060053477 | 28.08.2006 Original published format: FR 0653477 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1895687 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/08 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
H04B10/0791 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Title | German: | Fehlerortung in Maschennetzwerken | [2008/10] | English: | Fault location in meshed networks | [2008/10] | French: | Localisation de défaillance dans des réseaux maillés | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 15.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/30] | 07.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006029391 (YUKI MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0046] , [0057] , [0107] , [0115] - [0119] - [0168] , [0172] , [0182]; figures 1,2,5,6,10,12,18 *; | [A] - HAMAZUMI ET AL., "Optical Path Fault Management in Layered Networks", IEEE GLOBECOM 1998 SYDNEY,NSW, AUSTRALIA, IEEE GLOBECOM 1998 (Cat. NO. 98CH36250) IEEE Piscataway, NJ, USA, (19981108), vol. 4, ISBN 0-7803-4984-9, pages 2309 - 2314 vol., XP002429551 [A] 1-19 * page 2311, column L, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 2312, column L, paragraph 1 * * figures 4-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1998.775942 |