EP1854487 - Combinations of an 11-beta-hydroxysteroid dehaydrogenase type 1 inhibitor and a glucocorticoid receptor agonist [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states High Point Pharmaceuticals, LLC 4170 Mendenhall Oaks Parkway High Point, NC 27265 / US | [2009/10] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states TransTech Pharma, Inc 4170 Mendenhall Oaks Pkwy High Point NC 27265 / US | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Corporate Patents, Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kampen, Gita NOVO NORDISK A/S Gærdebuen 18 DK-2850 Nærum / DK | 02 /
Andersen, Henrik, Sune Gustav Adolphs Vej 2 2800 Lyngby / DK | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Russell, Lindsey, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Bailey, Lindsey, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
Former [2008/39] | Bailey, Lindsey, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07114939.7 | 06.04.2004 | [2007/46] | Priority number, date | DK20030000569 | 11.04.2003 Original published format: DK 200300569 | DK20030000566 | 11.04.2003 Original published format: DK 200300566 | DK20030000565 | 11.04.2003 Original published format: DK 200300565 | DK20030000571 | 11.04.2003 Original published format: DK 200300571 | DK20030000570 | 11.04.2003 Original published format: DK 200300570 | DK20030000568 | 11.04.2003 Original published format: DK 200300568 | US20030467284P | 02.05.2003 Original published format: US 467284 P | US20030467453P | 02.05.2003 Original published format: US 467453 P | US20030467363P | 02.05.2003 Original published format: US 467363 P | US20030467362P | 02.05.2003 Original published format: US 467362 P | US20030467443P | 02.05.2003 Original published format: US 467443 P | US20030467800P | 02.05.2003 Original published format: US 467800 P | DK20030000778 | 22.05.2003 Original published format: DK 200300778 | DK20030000776 | 22.05.2003 Original published format: DK 200300776 | US20030475157P | 02.06.2003 Original published format: US 475157 P | US20030475195P | 02.06.2003 Original published format: US 475195 P | DK20030000972 | 27.06.2003 Original published format: DK 200300972 | DK20030000990 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: DK 200300990 | DK20030000989 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: DK 200300989 | DK20030000988 | 30.06.2003 Original published format: DK 200300988 | DK20030000998 | 02.07.2003 Original published format: DK 200300998 | US20030486078P | 10.07.2003 Original published format: US 486078 P | US20030486098P | 10.07.2003 Original published format: US 486098 P | US20030486094P | 10.07.2003 Original published format: US 486094 P | US20030486095P | 10.07.2003 Original published format: US 486095 P | US20030486097P | 10.07.2003 Original published format: US 486097 P | DK20030001910 | 22.12.2003 Original published format: DK 200301910 | DK20040000009 | 06.01.2004 Original published format: DK 200400009 | US20040537099P | 16.01.2004 Original published format: US 537099 P | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1854487 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1854487 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61P35/00 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/21] |
Former [2007/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kombinationspräparate welche einen 11-beta-Hydroxysteroiddehydrogenase Typ-1 Hemmer und einen Agonist des Glucocorticoidrezeptors enthalten | [2007/46] | English: | Combinations of an 11-beta-hydroxysteroid dehaydrogenase type 1 inhibitor and a glucocorticoid receptor agonist | [2007/46] | French: | Combinaisons d'un inhibiteur de 11-beta-hydroxystéroïde déhydrogénase, type 1, et d'un agoniste d'un récepteur glucocorticoïde | [2007/46] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/39] | 12.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04725890.0 / EP1615667 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040725890) is 26.02.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1176140 (MITSUBISHI PHARMA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,14-23 * pages 10-11; claims 22, 25, 27, 30 * * pages 37-38 *; | [X]WO02076435 (UNIV EDINBURGH [GB], et al) [X] 1,14-19,22,23 * page 10, lines 7-13; claims 39-41 * * page 5, lines 24-31; figure 21; example 11 * * pages 8-9 * * page 4, lines 8-13 *; | [A] - BARF T ET AL, "ARYLSULFONAMIDOTHIAZOLES AS A CLASS OF POTENTIAL ANTIDIABETIC DRUGS.DI", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US LNKD- DOI:10.1021/JM025530F, (20020101), vol. 45, no. 18, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3813 - 3815, XP002993387 [A] 2-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm025530f | [A] - TADAYYON M ET AL, "INSULIN SENSITISATION IN THE TREATMENT OF TYPE 2 DIABETES", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS LTD., LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1517/13543784.12.3.307, (20030301), vol. 12, no. 3, ISSN 1354-3784, pages 307 - 324, XP008048351 [A] 1,14-23 * page 317 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543784.12.3.307 | [A] - KURUKULASURIYA R ET AL, "Potential Drug Targets and Progress Towards Pharmacologic Inhibition of Hepatic Glucose Production", CURRENT MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, BENTHAM SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, BE, (20030101), vol. 10, no. 2, ISSN 0929-8673, pages 123 - 153, XP008094636 [A] 1,14-23 * pages 132-133 * |