EP1900969 - Reduction Gear Mechanism and Electric Power Steering Apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuroumaru, Yoshikazu c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, C Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
Kamatani, Yasuhiro c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, C Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 03 /
Saruwatari, Takehiro c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, C Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 04 /
Otsuki, Hidetaka c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, C Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 05 /
Otsuki, Takumi c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, C Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Selting, Günther Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2008/12] | Selting, Günther Deichmannhaus am Dom, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07115035.3 | 27.08.2007 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | JP20060249885 | 14.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006249885 | JP20070160239 | 18.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007160239 | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1900969 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1900969 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1900969 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16H1/06, B62D5/04 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
B62D5/0412 (EP,US);
F16H57/12 (EP,US);
F16H2057/121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/19] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Untersetzungsgetriebe-Mechanismus und elektrische Servolenkung | [2008/12] | English: | Reduction Gear Mechanism and Electric Power Steering Apparatus | [2008/12] | French: | Mécanisme de réduction d'engrenage et appareil à direction assistée électrique | [2008/12] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 04.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US1067144 (SCHILLING CHARLES R [US]) [X] 1-3 * figure 4 * [A] 8; | [X]JPS4844663 (*******) [X] 1-5,8 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]JPS5544129 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US4236448 (WIELAND ERICH G) [X] 1,7 * claims 1-7 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]GB2125927 (AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 9; | [XA]JPS60113857 (RICOH KK) [X] 1-5 * figures 1-3 * [A] 7; | [A]JP2002037100 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [A] 1,9* figure 5 *; | [Y]US2002148673 (MENJAK ZDRAVKO [US], et al) [Y] 9 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2004113006 (DELPHI TECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * page 8, line 28 * * figures 1,2 * |