EP2031796 - Method and apparatus for multicast tree allocation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neto, Augusto Rua Adolfo loureiro, 35, 2 Esq 3030-049, Coimbra / PT | 02 /
Curado, Marilia Tv da Rua da Trauleira, Carvalhais de Baixo 3040-688, Coimbra / PT | 03 /
Monteiro, Edmundo Tv da Rua da Trauleira, Carvalhais de Baixo 3040-688, Coimbra / PT | 04 /
Mendes, Paulo Else-Rosenfeld-Str. 19 81673, Munich / DE | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/10] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 (Fünf Höfe) 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07115344.9 | 30.08.2007 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2031796 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2031796 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
H04L12/185 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2011/42] |
Former [2010/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [2009/46] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Multicast-Baumzuweisung | [2009/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for multicast tree allocation | [2009/10] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'attribution d'une arborescence de multidiffusion | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.02.2011 | 04.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Designated contracting state(s) TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 21.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1814269 (JUNIPER NETWORKS INC [US]) [A] 1,9* page 9, column 16, paragraph 76 - page 11, column 20, paragraph 97; figure 11 *; | [XY] - LAO ET AL, "Tackling group-to-tree matching in large scale group communications", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070523), vol. 51, no. 11, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 3069 - 3089, XP022094097 [X] 1-6,8,11-16 * page 3069, column L, paragraph 1. - page 3071, column L, paragraph 2.1.; figure 1 * * page 3072, column L, paragraph 2.2.3. - page 3074, column R, paragraph 3.2. * * page 3076, column L, paragraph 4.1. - page 3077, column R, paragraph 4.1; figure 2 * * page 3078, column R, paragraph 4.5. * [Y] 7,9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.comnet.2007.01.003 | [Y] - SONG GUO ET AL, "A Distributed Minimum Energy Multicast Algorithm in MANETs", WORLD OF WIRELESS, MOBILE AND MULTIMEDIA NETWORKS, 2006. WOWMOM 2006. INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON A BUFFALO-NIAGARA FALLS, NY, USA 26-29 JUNE 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060626), ISBN 0-7695-2593-8, pages 134 - 142, XP010925858 [Y] 7,9,10 * page 2, paragraph 3.2 * * page 3, paragraph 3.4 - paragraph 3.5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WOWMOM.2006.8 |