EP1897576 - Portable breathing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Actegy Limited 8 Queens Square Ascot Business Park, Lyndhurst Road Ascot Berkshire SL5 9FE / GB | [2012/48] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states High Tech Health Limited 8 Queens Square Ascot Business Park, Lyndhurst Road Ascot Berkshire SL5 9FE / GB | ||
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Brown, Roger Leslie 8 Cranston Road Forest Hill London SE23 2HB / GB | ||
For all designated states Sumners, David Paul 6 Littondale Court Ingleby, Barwick Stock-on-Tees TS17 0QZ / GB | |||
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states South Bank University Enterprises Limited 103 Borough Road London SE1 0AA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Roger Leslie 8 Cranston Road, Forest Hill London SE23 2HB / GB | 02 /
Sumners, David Paul 6 Littondale Court Ingleby Barwick Stockton-on-Tees TS17 0QZ / GB | [2017/20] |
Former [2009/23] | 01 /
see applicant ... | ||
Former [2008/11] | 01 /
Brown, Roger Leslie 8 Cranston Road Forest Hill London SE23 2HB / GB | ||
02 /
Sumners, David Paul 6 Littondale Court Ingleby Barwick Stockton-on-Tees TS17 0QZ / GB | Representative(s) | Akers, Noel James, et al N.J. Akers & Co 63 Lemon Street Truro, TR1 2PN / GB | [2017/20] |
Former [2010/21] | Akers, Noel James, et al N.J. Akers & Co. 7 Ferris Town Truro Cornwall TR1 3JG / GB | ||
Former [2008/11] | Lucas, Phillip Brian Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07115407.4 | 31.08.2007 | [2008/11] | Priority number, date | GB20060017349 | 05.09.2006 Original published format: GB 0617349 | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1897576 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1897576 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
A61M16/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/08 (GB);
A61M16/0006 (EP,US);
A61M16/021 (EP);
A61M16/0866 (EP,US);
A61M16/161 (EP,US);
A61M16/205 (EP,US);
A63B21/00061 (EP,US);
A63B21/00069 (EP,US);
A63B21/00196 (EP,US);
A63B21/0085 (EP,US);
A63B23/18 (EP,GB,US);
A63B24/0062 (EP,US);
A63B71/0622 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0018 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3569 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3584 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,US);
A61M2205/502 (EP,US);
A61M2205/52 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8206 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8237 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8275 (EP,US);
A63B2024/0068 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0625 (EP,US);
A63B21/0088 (EP,US);
A63B2220/72 (EP,US);
A63B2220/74 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2017/20] |
Former [2008/47] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tragbares Beatmungsgerät | [2008/11] | English: | Portable breathing device | [2008/11] | French: | Dispositif respiratoire portable | [2008/11] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 17.05.2017 | IT | 17.05.2017 | [2018/15] |
Former [2017/50] | ES | 17.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6083141 (HOUGEN EVERETT D [US]); | [X]WO0047258 (HUGHES ARTHUR R [US]); | [Y]US6581596 (TRUITT PATRICK W [US], et al); | [XY]EP1464357 (DHD HEALTHCARE CORP [US]) |