EP1914589 - Liquid crystal display apparatus and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Young-kook Daewoo Prugio 2-danji Apt.203-909 Omokcheon-dong, Gwonseon-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/46] |
Former [2008/17] | 01 /
Kim, Young-kook Daewoo Prugio 2-danji Apt.203-909 Omokcheon-dong, Gwonseon-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/17] | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07115605.3 | 04.09.2007 | [2008/17] | Priority number, date | KR20060100539 | 16.10.2006 Original published format: KR 20060100539 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1914589 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1914589 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13357, G09G3/34 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
G02F1/133603 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G09G3/3406 (EP,US);
G02F1/133628 (EP,US);
G09G2320/064 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2009/01] |
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeige und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2008/17] | English: | Liquid crystal display apparatus and control method thereof | [2008/17] | French: | Appareil à affichage à cristaux liquides et procédé de contrôle correspondant | [2008/17] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 24.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002311416 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-28 * abstract * * claims 1,2 * * paragraph [0028] *; | [A]US2003218602 (NAITO KEIJIRO [JP]) [A] 1,8,11,15,22,25 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2005340065 (HARISON TOSHIBA LIGHTING CORP) [A] 1,8,11,15,22,25 * abstract *; | [A]US2006132699 (CHO JOO-WOAN [KR], et al) [A] 1,8,11 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2006192750 (LAI CHING-KUN [TW]) [A] 1,8,11,15,22,25* abstract * |