EP1898252 - Optical compensation film stack and stretched retardation film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/11] | Optical compensation film and retardation film | ||
[2013/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 746-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 746-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doi, Toru 2-802, Hoshimigaoka Kuwana-shi Mie 511-0912 / JP | 02 /
Shimosato, Shinji 7-7, Kamajima Yatomi-shi Aichi 498-0035 / JP | 03 /
Obara, Naoto 2-25-802, Bankochou Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0804 / JP | [2014/18] |
Former [2008/11] | 01 /
Doi, Toru 2-802, Hoshimigaoka Kuwana-shi Mie 511-0912 / JP | ||
02 /
Shimosato, Shinji 7-7, Kamajima Yatomi-shi Aichi 498-0035 / JP | |||
03 /
Obara, Naoto 2-25-802, Bankochou Yokkaichi-shi Mie 510-0804 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07115650.9 | 04.09.2007 | [2008/11] | Priority number, date | JP20060239767 | 05.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006239767 | JP20060273046 | 04.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006273046 | JP20060316322 | 22.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006316322 | JP20070195756 | 27.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007195756 | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1898252 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1898252 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13363, B32B27/36, G02B5/30 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
G02F1/133634 (EP,US);
G02F1/13363 (KR);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
G02B5/3016 (EP,US);
C09K2323/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2008/47] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Filmstapel zur optischen Kompensation und gestreckter Verzögerungsfilm | [2013/48] | English: | Optical compensation film stack and stretched retardation film | [2013/48] | French: | Empilement de films de compensation optique et film étiré à retard optique | [2013/48] |
Former [2008/11] | Film zur optischen Kompensation und Verzögerungsfilm | ||
Former [2008/11] | Optical compensation film and retardation film | ||
Former [2008/11] | Film de compensation optique et film de retard | Examination procedure | 27.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 13.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.10.2013 | 18.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003286319 (CHISSO CORP, et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [DA]US2005059777 (DOI TORU [JP]) [DA] 1-22 * abstract *; | [DX]JP2005156862 (TOSOH CORP) [DX] 10,11,21 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006019112 (JSR CORP [JP], et al) [A] 3-7,9,13-22 * abstract *; | [PDA]JP2006249318 (TOSOH CORP) [PDA] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP1780562 (JSR CORP [JP])[PA] 3-7,9,13-22 |