EP1897739 - Electrical device cooling structure in vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
GB
Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | For:DE
GB
Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukazu, Tomohiro c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Nishibori, Takeo c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
Shibuya, Kentaro c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
Kawata, Masao c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 05 /
Yamaguchi, Hiroo c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 06 /
Fujisawa, Junya c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 07 /
Nakano, Atsushi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 08 /
Kosaka, Hiroshi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2010/28] |
Former [2008/11] | 01 /
Fukazu, Tomohiro c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-sh Saitama 351-0193 / JP | ||
02 /
Nishibori, Takeo c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-sh Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
03 /
Shibuya, Kentaro c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-sh Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
04 /
Kawata, Masao c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-sh Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
05 /
Yamaguchi, Hiroo c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-sh Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
06 /
Fujisawa, Junya c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-sh Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
07 /
Nakano, Atsushi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-sh Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
08 /
Kosaka, Hiroshi c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-sh Saitama 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Rupp, Christian Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07115723.4 | 05.09.2007 | [2008/11] | Priority number, date | JP20060242488 | 07.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006242488 | JP20060242489 | 07.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006242489 | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1897739 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1897739 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60K1/04, H01M2/10, H01M10/50 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
B60K1/04 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
B60L1/003 (EP,US);
B60L50/64 (EP,US);
B60L50/66 (EP,US);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,US);
H01M10/643 (EP,US);
H01M10/6563 (EP,US);
H01M10/6566 (EP,US);
H01M50/202 (EP,US);
H01M50/224 (EP,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,US);
H01M6/5038 (EP,US);
H05K7/20909 (EP,US);
B60K2001/005 (EP,US);
B60K2001/0416 (EP,US);
B60L2210/12 (EP,US);
B60L2210/40 (EP,US);
B60L2240/525 (EP,US);
B60L2270/147 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/10 (EP);
B60Y2200/11 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/47] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühlstruktur einer elektrischen Vorrichtung in einem Fahrzeug | [2008/11] | English: | Electrical device cooling structure in vehicle | [2008/11] | French: | Structure de refroidissement de dispositif électrique dans un véhicule | [2008/11] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 24.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1067006 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US6188574 (ANAZAWA MAKOTO [JP]); | [A]US2003019232 (MATSUO KAZUYA [JP], et al); | [A]JP2004306726 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [AD]JP2005153827 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [X]US2005285563 (YONEDA SHOGO [JP]); | [PX]EP1745977 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [PX]WO2007031689 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR], et al) |