EP1898606 - Hinge device having a plurality of axes for a portable terminal and a connection member having the plurality of axes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | ||
Former [2008/11] | For:DE
FR
GB
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jin-Soo c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Young-Ki c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kang, Shin-Chul c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07115815.8 | 06.09.2007 | [2008/11] | Priority number, date | KR20060086210 | 07.09.2006 Original published format: KR 20060086210 | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1898606 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1898606 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1898606 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
H04M1/0212 (EP,US);
H04B1/38 (KR);
H04M1/0214 (EP,US);
H04M1/0231 (EP,US);
H04M1/0233 (EP,US);
H04M1/0247 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/48] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Scharniervorrichtung mit mehreren Achsen für ein tragbares Endgerät und Anschlusselement mit mehreren Achsen | [2008/11] | English: | Hinge device having a plurality of axes for a portable terminal and a connection member having the plurality of axes | [2008/11] | French: | Dispositif à charnière doté d'une pluralité d'axes pour un terminal portable et élément de connexion doté d'une pluralité d'axes | [2008/11] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 30.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1475943 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 16,17,20 * figures 6-8,10 *; | [A]EP1530346 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [XY]EP1686768 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-15,18,19 * the whole document * [Y] 16,17,20 | by applicant | EP1475943 | EP1686768 |