EP2033847 - Safety belt holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Suite 800 Fairlane Plaza South 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Suite 800 Fairlane Plaza South 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masic, Malte Sr. Bureds Gärde 6 SE-424 91 Olofstorp / SE | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2009/11] | Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 07115923.0 | 07.09.2007 | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2033847 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2033847 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R13/02, // B60R22/18 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
B60R22/18 (EP);
B60R13/0237 (EP);
B60R2022/1818 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2009/47] |
Former [2009/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitsgurthalter | [2009/11] | English: | Safety belt holder | [2009/11] | French: | Support de ceinture de sécurité | [2009/11] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 12.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 11.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4817754 (MURAMOTO HISAO [JP]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]FR2701906 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract *; | [A]US2003173767 (KOBAYASHI AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1-24 * abstract *; | [DA]US2003222451 (NIIMI DAISUKE [JP]) [DA] 1-24; | [A]DE10231824 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * |