EP1903432 - Audible computer user interface method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avaya Inc. 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Avaya Inc. 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US | ||
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states AVAYA TECHNOLOGY LLC 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michaelis, Paul Roller 1918 Quail Circle Louisville CO 80027 / US | 02 /
Mohler, David S 8304 Urban Court Arvada CO 80005 / US | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07115940.4 | 07.09.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | US20060522192 | 14.09.2006 Original published format: US 522192 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1903432 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1903432 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/16, G06F3/048 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
G06F3/04812 (EP,US);
G06F3/167 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/13] | G06F3/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/51] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für eine hörbare Benutzerschnittstelle | [2008/13] | English: | Audible computer user interface method and apparatus | [2008/13] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'interface utilisateur audible d'ordinateur | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 15.10.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 25.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5374924 (MCKIEL JR FRANK A [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7-11,13,15 * column 1, line 19 - line 20 * * column 1, line 49 - line 51 * * column 2, line 24 - line 55 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 36 * * column 5, line 17 - line 66; figures 1,2,4 * [I] 4,6,12,14; | [A]US6469712 (HILPERT JR EDWIN JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6-11,14-15 * column 5, line 39 - line 51 * * column 6, line 15 - column 7, line 67 ** column 10, line 45 - line 55; figures 4,6 *; | [XI]US6532005 (CAMPBELL LOWELL [US]) [X] 1-2,5,8-10,13 * column 1, line 13 - line 18 * * column 2, line 5 - line 10 * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 29 * * column 3, line 54 - line 67; figure - * [I] 3-4,6-7,11-12,14-15; | [XI] - MCKIEL F JR, Audio-enabled graphical user interface for the blind or visually impaired, COMPUTING APPLICATIONS TO ASSIST PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES, 1992., PRO CEEDINGS OF THE JOHNS HOPKINS NATIONAL SEARCH FOR LAUREL, MD, USA 1-5 FEB. 1992, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, PAGE(S) 185 - 187, (19920201), ISBN 9780818627309, XP010028045 [X] 1-3,5,7-11,13,15 * the whole document * [I] 4,6,12,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CAAPWD.1992.217372 | by applicant | US5374924 | US6469712 | US6532005 |