EP1913853 - Apparatus for cooking food products in a quick manner on both sides thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTROLUX PROFESSIONAL S.p.A. Viale Treviso 15 33170 Pordenone / IT | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TASSAN MANGINA, Franco Via Daniele Concina 3 33080, MARSURE (Pordenone) / IT | 02 /
FADELLI, Marino Via Matteotti 12 31014, COLLE UMBERTO (Treviso) / IT | 03 /
DORIGO, Roberto Via Falconara 97 30021, CAORLE (Venezia) / IT | 04 /
ULIAN, Marco Via Nazionale 80 33050, FIUMICELLO (Udine) / IT | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Markovina, Paolo, et al Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Markovina, Paolo, et al Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | ||
Former [2008/17] | Gonella, Mario, et al Propria S.r.l. P.O. Box 365 Via della Colonna, 35 33170 Pordenone / IT | Application number, filing date | 07116553.4 | 17.09.2007 | [2008/17] | Priority number, date | IT2006PN00081 | 17.10.2006 Original published format: IT PN20060081 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1913853 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1913853 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | [2009/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1913853 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/06, H05B6/80 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
A47J37/0611 (EP,US);
H05B6/6402 (EP,US);
H05B6/6426 (EP,US);
H05B6/6482 (EP,US);
A47J2037/0617 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/17] | A47J37/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum schnellen beidseitigen Kochen von Lebensmitteln | [2008/17] | English: | Apparatus for cooking food products in a quick manner on both sides thereof | [2008/17] | French: | Appareil pour la cuisson rapide de produits alimentaires des deux côtés | [2008/17] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.10.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.05.2010 | BE | 26.05.2010 | CY | 26.05.2010 | CZ | 26.05.2010 | DK | 26.05.2010 | EE | 26.05.2010 | FI | 26.05.2010 | LT | 26.05.2010 | LV | 26.05.2010 | MT | 26.05.2010 | NL | 26.05.2010 | PL | 26.05.2010 | RO | 26.05.2010 | SI | 26.05.2010 | SK | 26.05.2010 | TR | 26.05.2010 | BG | 26.08.2010 | GR | 27.08.2010 | ES | 06.09.2010 | IE | 17.09.2010 | LU | 17.09.2010 | IS | 26.09.2010 | PT | 27.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | HU | 27.11.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
TR | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IE | 17.09.2010 | ||
LU | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 27.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
TR | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IE | 17.09.2010 | ||
LU | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 27.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IE | 17.09.2010 | ||
LU | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 27.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IE | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 27.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IE | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
MT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IE | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IE | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IE | 17.09.2010 | ||
IT | 17.09.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]WO9944394 (GVL GES ZUM VERTRIEB VON LEBEN [DE], et al) [DY] 1,2 * page 13, line 21 - page 15, line 19; figures 1-6 * [A] 3; | [YA]WO03098972 (O ZON INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2 * page 3, line 25 - page 6, line 28; figures 1-3 * [A] 3; | [DPA]EP1714595 (ELECTROLUX PROFESSIONAL SPA [IT]) [DPA] 1-3* paragraphs [0012] - [0025]; figures 1-3 * |