Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
01.11.2011 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.09.2011 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
15.03.2011 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
06.10.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.10.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.02.2009 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
14.11.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
11.11.2008 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.10.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |
10.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant | |
07.03.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |