EP1868199 - An optical disc recording and reproducing apparatus for performing a formatting process as a background process and a method for formatting an optical disc by a background process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 20.02.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Hirokuni c/o Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-2-3, Shinyokohama, Kohoku-ku,Yokohama-shi Kanagawa, 222-8530 / JP | [2008/19] |
Former [2007/51] | 01 /
Hashimoto, Hirokuni 5-14-38-402, Hiyoshi Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07117370.2 | 24.08.1998 | [2007/51] | Priority number, date | JP19970227921 | 25.08.1997 Original published format: JP 22792197 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1868199 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
G06F3/0638 (EP,US);
G06F3/0617 (EP,US);
G06F3/0677 (EP,US);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1221 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2007/51] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabevorrichtung für eine optische Platte zur Durchführung eines Formatierungsprozesses als Hintergrundprozess und Verfahren zur Formatierung einer optischen Platte mittels Hintergrundprozess | [2007/51] | English: | An optical disc recording and reproducing apparatus for performing a formatting process as a background process and a method for formatting an optical disc by a background process | [2007/51] | French: | Enregistrement de disque optique et appareil de reproduction pour réaliser un procédé de formatage en tant que procédé de fond et procédé pour le formatage d'un disque optique en procédé de fond | [2007/51] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 20.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/13] | 18.02.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.03.2015 | 27.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98115896.7 / EP0899735 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980115896) is 24.05.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08203211 ; | [A]GB2045479 (CII HONEYWELL BULL) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0328240 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US4888691 (GEORGE PAUL L [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [DA]US5559778 (INOKUCHI TATSUYA [JP], et al) [DA] 1-12 * abstract *; | [DAP]US5745459 (INOKUCHI TATSUYA [JP], et al) [DAP] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08203211 A 19960809 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] * column A * |