EP2044935 - A composition containing non-psychotropic cannabinoids for the treatment of inflammatory diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivacell Biotechnology Espana S.L. Avda. Conde de Vallellano, 13, 1-1 14004 Cordoba / ES | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muñoz Blanco, Eduardo VIVACELL BIOTECHNOLOGY ESPAÑA, S.L. Avda. Conde de Vallellano, 13, 1-1 14004, Córdoba / ES | 02 /
Appendino, Giovanni VIVACELL BIOTECHNOLOGY ESPAÑA, S.L. Avda. Conde de Vallellano, 13, 1-1 14004, Córdoba / ES | 03 /
Fiebich, Bernd L. VIVACELL BIOTECHNOLOGY ESPAÑA, S.L. Avda. Conde de Vallellano, 13, 1-1 14004, Córdoba / ES | 04 /
Grassi, Giampaolo VIVACELL BIOTECHNOLOGY ESPAÑA, S.L. Avda. Conde de Vallellano, 13, 1-1 14004, Córdoba / ES | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Illescas, Manuel GONZÁLEZ-BUENO & ILLESCAS Calle de Recoletos, 13 - 5 lzq. 28001 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Illescas, Manuel GONZÁLEZ-BUENO & ILLESCAS Calle de Recoletos, 13 - 5 lzq. 28001 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2009/15] | Pons Arino, Angel Pons Patentes y Marcas Internacional, S.L. Glorieta Ruben Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 07117778.6 | 02.10.2007 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2044935 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2044935 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/05, A61K31/352, A61K36/185, A61P29/00, A61P35/00 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
A61K31/05 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung mit nicht-psychotropen Cannabinoiden zur Behandlung von Entzündungserkrankungen | [2009/15] | English: | A composition containing non-psychotropic cannabinoids for the treatment of inflammatory diseases | [2009/15] | French: | Composition contenant des cannabinoïdes non psychotropes pour le traitement de maladies inflammatoires | [2009/15] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2008 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2010 | Observations by third parties | 03.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2011 | BE | 05.01.2011 | CY | 05.01.2011 | CZ | 05.01.2011 | DK | 05.01.2011 | EE | 05.01.2011 | FI | 05.01.2011 | HU | 05.01.2011 | LT | 05.01.2011 | LV | 05.01.2011 | MT | 05.01.2011 | PL | 05.01.2011 | RO | 05.01.2011 | SE | 05.01.2011 | SI | 05.01.2011 | SK | 05.01.2011 | TR | 05.01.2011 | BG | 05.04.2011 | GR | 06.04.2011 | IS | 05.05.2011 | PT | 05.05.2011 | IE | 02.10.2011 | LU | 02.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
MT | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
TR | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 02.10.2011 | ||
LU | 02.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
MT | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 02.10.2011 | ||
LU | 02.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
MT | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 02.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
IE | 02.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
BE | 05.01.2011 | ||
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 05.01.2011 | |
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | LT | 05.01.2011 | |
SI | 05.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9952524 (MATHILDA & TERENCE KENNEDY INS [GB], et al) [Y] 1-13 * whole document;; claims 1-3,5-8 * * page 5, lines 5-10 *; | [XY]US6403126 (WEBSTER G R BARRIE [CA], et al) [X] 2,11-13 * column 2, lines 5-19,37-39 * * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 1 * * column 4, lines 4-22 * * column 5, lines 2-12 * * column 6, lines 23-29 * * claims 1,8 * [Y] 1-13; | [DX] - 7 REUNION ANUAL, SOCIEDAD ESPAÑOLA DE INVESTIGACION SOBRE CANNABINOIDES, TOLEDO, 23-25 NOVIEMBRE 2006, (200611), pages 1 - 44, URL: http://www.ucm.es/info/seic-web/libro2006.pdf, (20080130), XP002469010 [DX] 1,3-12 * page 33 * * page 34 * | [Y] - EVANS A T ET AL, "CONSTITUENTS OF CANNABIS-SATIVA INHIBIT LIPOXYGENASE ACTIVITY", JOURNAL OF PHARMACY AND PHARMACOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (19850909), vol. 37, ISSN 0022-3573, page 43P, XP002114256 [Y] 1-13 * whole document * | [Y] - BARRETT ML ET AL, "Cannflavin A and B, prenylated flavones from Cannabis sativa L", EXPERIENTIA, BIRKHAEUSER VERLAG. BASEL, CH, (19860415), vol. 42, no. 4, ISSN 0014-4754, pages 452 - 453, XP002114248 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02118655 | [Y] - ELSOHLY H ET AL, "CANNIPRENE A PROTOTYPE ANTI-INFLAMMATORY NATURAL PRODUCT", PLANTA MEDICA, THIEME, STUTTGART, DE, (1990), vol. 56, no. 6, ISSN 0032-0943, pages 662 - 663, XP009095318 [Y] 1-13 * whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2006-961322 | [Y] - BAEK S H ET AL, "BORON TRIFLUORIDE ETHERATE ON SILICA-A MODIFIED LEWIS ACID REAGENT (7). ANTITUMOR ACTIVITY OF CANNABIGEROL AGAINST HUMAN ORAL EPITHELOID CARCINOMA CELLS", ARCHIVES OF PHARMACAL RESEARCH, NATL. FISHERIES UNIVERSITY, PUSAN, KR, (199806), vol. 21, no. 3, ISSN 0253-6269, pages 353 - 356, XP000957635 [Y] 1-13 * abstract * | [DY] - YANG KUO-CHING ET AL, "Molecular mechanisms of denbinobin-induced anti-tumorigenesis effect in colon cancer cells.", WORLD JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY : WJG 28 MAY 2005, (20050528), vol. 11, no. 20, ISSN 1007-9327, pages 3040 - 3045, XP002469127 [DY] 1-13 * abstract * | other | - "Majoon-e-Rawand Barae Dard-e-Meda", TKDL, Database accession no. MH5/1398, XP003024332 | - MOHAMMAD AKBAR ARZANI, Qaraabaadeen Qaadri, (1968), page 202 | - "Shahdanaj", TKDL, Database accession no. AH1/414, XP003024333 | - ABU ALI IBN-E-SINA, Al-Qaanoon-fil-Tibb, (1987), page 253 | - "Sarvangasothahara", TKDL, Database accession no. RS23/981B, XP003024334 | - VÄGABHATA, Astänga Hrdaya, (1998), page 705 | - "Kodaga Sala Kuligai", TKDL, Database accession no. GP04/82, XP003024335 | - THERAYAR, Therayar Maha Karisal, (1974), pages 84 - 87 |