EP1914136 - Parking brake, particularly for a farm tractor, with a safety device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Italia S.p.A. Viale delle Nazioni, 55 41100 Modena / IT | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benedetti, Giorgio Via Zurlini 124 41100, Modena / IT | 02 /
Vescovini, Maurizio Via Budrione Migliarina 86/1 41012 (MO), Carpi / IT | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | CNH IP Department c/o CNH Belgium NV, Patent Department, Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 07118051.7 | 08.10.2007 | [2008/17] | Priority number, date | IT2006BO00714 | 16.10.2006 Original published format: IT BO20060714 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1914136 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1914136 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/22 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
B60T13/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Title | German: | Feststellbremse mit Sicherheitsvorrichtung, im Besonderen für einen Ackerschlepper | [2008/17] | English: | Parking brake, particularly for a farm tractor, with a safety device | [2008/17] | French: | Frein à main, en particulier pour tracteur agricole, doté d'un dispositif de sécurité | [2008/17] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 09.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.2009 | BE | 06.05.2009 | CY | 06.05.2009 | CZ | 06.05.2009 | DK | 06.05.2009 | EE | 06.05.2009 | FI | 06.05.2009 | LT | 06.05.2009 | LV | 06.05.2009 | MT | 06.05.2009 | NL | 06.05.2009 | PL | 06.05.2009 | RO | 06.05.2009 | SI | 06.05.2009 | SK | 06.05.2009 | TR | 06.05.2009 | BG | 06.08.2009 | SE | 06.08.2009 | GR | 07.08.2009 | ES | 17.08.2009 | IS | 06.09.2009 | PT | 06.09.2009 | IE | 08.10.2009 | LU | 08.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | HU | 07.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LV | 06.05.2009 | ||
MT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
IE | 08.10.2009 | ||
LU | 08.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
HU | 07.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LV | 06.05.2009 | ||
MT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
IE | 08.10.2009 | ||
LU | 08.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LV | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
IE | 08.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LV | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LV | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
LT | 06.05.2009 | ||
LV | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IS | 06.09.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3613839 (MACDUFF STANLEY I) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP1516791 (CNH ITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1541438 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |