EP1942689 - REUSE PATTERN NETWORK SCHEDULING USING INTERFERENCE LEVELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Semiconductor Limited 2-10-23 Shin-Yokohama Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | [2010/25] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Fujitsu Microelectronics Limited 2-10-23 Shin-Yokohama Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0033 / JP | ||
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhu, Chenxi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Na Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Viorel, Dorin c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Na Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Seshadri, Jagan c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Na Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Agre, Jonathan c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Na Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Chen, Wei-Peng c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Na Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/28] | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07118158.0 | 09.10.2007 | [2008/28] | Priority number, date | US20060864498 | 06.11.2006 Original published format: US 864498 | US20070777385 | 13.07.2007 Original published format: US 777385 | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1942689 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1942689 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | [2009/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/36 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
H04W16/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/40] |
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Netzterminierung mit Wiederverwendungsmustern unter Verwendung von Interferenzebenen | [2008/28] | English: | REUSE PATTERN NETWORK SCHEDULING USING INTERFERENCE LEVELS | [2008/28] | French: | Programmation de réseau à réseau de réutilisation utilisant des niveaux d'interférence | [2008/28] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 29.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 27.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006019701 (JI TINGFANG [US]); | [A]US2006159004 (JI TINGFANG [US]) | by applicant | US2006019701 |