EP1915897 - Combine header with feed drum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bomleny, Duane M 204 Amber Lane Geneseo, IL 61254 / US | 02 /
Salley, Gordon L 3454 - 14th Street Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07118491.5 | 15.10.2007 | [2008/18] | Priority number, date | US20060586997 | 26.10.2006 Original published format: US 586997 | [2008/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1915897 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/06 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
A01D41/06 (EP,US);
A01D61/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, IT, PL, SE [2009/02] |
Former [2008/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mähdrescherschneidwerk mit Fördertrommel | [2008/18] | English: | Combine header with feed drum | [2008/18] | French: | Dispositif de récolte de moissonneuse-batteuse avec tambour d'alimentation | [2008/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 31.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 14.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/43] | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1520558 (BROWN CARL R) [A] 1,8* figure 1 *; | [X]WO0074467 (TAYLOR ROBERT WILLIAM AMOS [AU]) [X] 1-8 * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 18; figures 1-3 * |