EP1916039 - Method for identifying objects and signature comparison device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rauh, Ingolf Oberzeller Str. 10 78479 Reichenau / DE | 02 /
Kreitmeier, Franz Thomas-Sättele-Str. 29 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2008/18] | Application number, filing date | 07118687.8 | 17.10.2007 | [2008/18] | Priority number, date | DE20061050083 | 24.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006050083 | [2008/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1916039 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1916039 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B07C3/14 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
B07C3/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Identifizieren von Gegenständen und Signaturvergleichsvorrichtung | [2008/18] | English: | Method for identifying objects and signature comparison device | [2008/18] | French: | Procédé et identification d'objets, et dispositif de comparaison de signature | [2008/18] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 31.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.12.2009 | CZ | 30.12.2009 | EE | 30.12.2009 | FI | 30.12.2009 | IE | 30.12.2009 | LT | 30.12.2009 | LV | 30.12.2009 | MT | 30.12.2009 | PL | 30.12.2009 | RO | 30.12.2009 | SI | 30.12.2009 | SK | 30.12.2009 | TR | 30.12.2009 | BG | 30.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | IS | 30.04.2010 | PT | 30.04.2010 | HU | 01.07.2010 | [2015/22] |
Former [2012/47] | CY | 30.12.2009 | |
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
MT | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
TR | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 30.12.2009 | |
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
MT | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 30.12.2009 | |
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
MT | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 30.12.2009 | |
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | CZ | 30.12.2009 | |
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | FI | 30.12.2009 | |
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP1222037 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-9 * paragraph [0007] *; | [A]WO2006100357 (SOLYSTIC [FR], et al) [A] 1-9* claim 6 * |