EP1914764 - Lithium-ion Capacitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Subaru Corporation 1-20-8, Ebisu Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8554 / JP | [2017/31] |
Former [2014/46] | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-20-8, Ebisu Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8554 / JP | ||
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-7-2, Nishishinjuku , Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8316 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanizaki, Hiroaki c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome S Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8316 / JP | 02 /
Ando, Nobuo c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8316 / JP | 03 /
Hatou, Yukinori c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8316 / JP | [2016/48] |
Former [2008/17] | 01 /
Tanizaki, Hiroaki c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome S Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8316 / JP | ||
02 /
Ando, Nobuo c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8316 / JP | |||
03 /
Hatou, Yukinori c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8316 / JP | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2016/48] |
Former [2008/41] | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Sajda, Wolf E. Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07118716.5 | 17.10.2007 | [2008/17] | Priority number, date | JP20060286051 | 20.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006286051 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1914764 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1914764 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01G11/24, H01G11/06, H01G11/50, H01G11/32 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
H01G11/32 (EP,US);
H01G4/008 (KR);
H01G11/06 (EP,US);
H01G11/24 (EP,US);
H01G11/50 (EP,US);
Y02E60/13 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/17] | H01G9/058, H01G9/042, H01G9/155 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2016/48] |
Former [2009/01] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lithiumionenkondensator | [2008/17] | English: | Lithium-ion Capacitor | [2008/17] | French: | Condensateur aux ions de lithium | [2008/17] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 24.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 30.11.2016 | [2017/41] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH06187974 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [YD]JPH0831420 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [YD] 2 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5953204 (SUHARA MANABU [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * column 7, line 45 - line 67 *; | [Y]US2001014422 (OMARU ATSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0059] *; | [Y]WO03003395 (KANEBO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2006025377 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *; | [Y]US2006057433 (ANDO NOBUO [JP], et al) [Y] 5,7 * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0095] *; | [Y]JP2006286923 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [PY]EP1798790 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP], et al) [PY] 1-7* paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * |