EP2051098 - A method and system for presence detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [2011/38] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South, Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Antonsson, Anders Fagottgatan 6 421 41 Västra Frölunda / SE | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2013/31] | Ekwall, Peter, et al Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/17] | Bergquist, Kjell Gunnar Albihns AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 07118876.7 | 19.10.2007 | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2051098 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/282, G01S7/285, G01S13/18, G01S13/56 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
G01S13/56 (EP,US);
G01S13/18 (EP,US);
G01S7/282 (EP,US);
G01S7/285 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2010/01] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System für Anwesenheitsdetektion | [2009/17] | English: | A method and system for presence detection | [2009/17] | French: | Procédé et système pour la détection de présence | [2009/17] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 23.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 02.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.09.2016 | 13.07.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.09.2016 | 20.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/49] | 30.07.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/49] | 27.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002158791 (MEIER THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1-7* paragraphs [0011] - [0019]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2005073424 (RUOSS HANS-OLIVER [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0037] - [0048]; figures 4,5 *; | [X]GB2421650 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-7 * page 3, line 31 - page 6, line 16; figure 1 * | Examination | WO9904285 | GB2348756 | by applicant | EP0213558 | US6426716 | US2002158791 | US2005073424 | GB2421650 |