EP1928141 - Transmitter for suppressing out-of-band power of a signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2008/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lozhkin, Alexander N. c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2012/40] |
Former [2008/23] | 01 /
Lozhkin, Alexander N. c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2008/23] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07118931.0 | 19.10.2007 | [2008/23] | Priority number, date | JP20060324736 | 30.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006324736 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1928141 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1928141 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1928141 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H03F3/21, H03G11/00 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
H04L27/2623 (EP,US);
H03G11/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/41] | H04L27/26, H03F3/21 | ||
Former IPC [2008/23] | H04L27/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/25] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sender zur Unterdrückung der Ausser-Band-Leistung eines Signals | [2012/35] | English: | Transmitter for suppressing out-of-band power of a signal | [2008/23] | French: | Transmetteur pour la suppression d' émission hors bande | [2012/35] |
Former [2008/23] | Sender zur Unterdrückung der Out-of-Band-Leistung eines Signals | ||
Former [2008/23] | Transmetteur pour la suppression d'alimentation hors bande d'un signal | Examination procedure | 10.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 12.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.05.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004076247 (BARAK ILAN SAUL [IL], et al) [I] 1,3,5,6,8 * abstract *; | [I]US2004234006 (LEUNG STEPHEN Y [US]) [I] 1,3,5,6,8 * figure 1; claims 1,3 * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] *; | [I]US2005008094 (KRAMER RONALF [DE], et al) [I] 1,3,5,6,8* figure 3; claim 25 * |