EP1922995 - Method for modelling a tracking curve of an in vivo device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/21] | System and method for modelling a tracking curve of an in vivo device | ||
[2012/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Given Imaging Ltd. 2 Hacarmel Street New Industrial Park 20692 Yoqneam / IL | [2011/31] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Given Imaging Limited 2 Hacarmel Street New Industrial Park 20692 Yoqneam llite / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horn, Eli 13 Barak 26315, Kiryat Motzkin / IL | 02 /
Gat, Daniel 5 HaAarava Street Nesher 36863, Haifa / IL | 03 /
Rabinovitz, Raphael 3 Ostrovski Street 43603, Raanana / IL | 04 /
Nitzan, Yaacov 42 HaAliya HaShnia 46320, Herzeliya / IL | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2008/21] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07118957.5 | 22.10.2007 | [2008/21] | Priority number, date | US20060583852 | 20.10.2006 Original published format: US 583852 | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1922995 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1922995 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/06, A61B1/04, A61B5/07 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
A61B1/041 (EP,US);
A61B5/061 (EP,US);
A61B5/073 (EP,US);
A61B5/4255 (EP,US);
A61B1/00016 (EP,US);
A61B1/00045 (EP,US);
A61B5/743 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/21] | A61B5/07, A61B1/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Modellieren einer Nachverfolgungskurve in einer Vivo-Vorrichtung | [2012/01] | English: | Method for modelling a tracking curve of an in vivo device | [2012/01] | French: | Procédé de modélisation d'une courbe de suivi d'un dispositif in vivo | [2012/01] |
Former [2008/21] | System und Verfahren zum Modellieren einer Nachverfolgungskurve in einer Vivo-Vorrichtung | ||
Former [2008/21] | System and method for modelling a tracking curve of an in vivo device | ||
Former [2008/21] | Système et procédé de modélisation d'une courbe de suivi d'un dispositif in vivo | Examination procedure | 13.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2007 | AT | 23.05.2012 | BE | 23.05.2012 | CY | 23.05.2012 | CZ | 23.05.2012 | DK | 23.05.2012 | EE | 23.05.2012 | FI | 23.05.2012 | IT | 23.05.2012 | LT | 23.05.2012 | LV | 23.05.2012 | MT | 23.05.2012 | NL | 23.05.2012 | PL | 23.05.2012 | RO | 23.05.2012 | SE | 23.05.2012 | SI | 23.05.2012 | SK | 23.05.2012 | TR | 23.05.2012 | BG | 23.08.2012 | GR | 24.08.2012 | ES | 03.09.2012 | IS | 23.09.2012 | PT | 24.09.2012 | IE | 22.10.2012 | LU | 22.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
MT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
LU | 22.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
MT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
MT | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
IE | 22.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
PL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
NL | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 23.05.2012 | |
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
FI | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 23.05.2012 | |
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 23.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005062717 (GIVEN IMAGING LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]WO2006003652 (GIVEN IMAGING LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,5,7 * abstract * * page 7 - page 12 * * claims 11-24 * * figures 2-5 *; | [A]US2006069317 (HORN ELI [IL], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP1676522 (GIVEN IMAGING LTD [IL]) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0086] * * figures 2,3,8,10 * | by applicant | WO2006003652 | EP1676522 |