EP1916819 - Compression device and associated decompression device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | ||
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niddam, David 19 rue du Médoc 31170 TOURNEFEUILLE / FR | 02 /
Delamotte, Luc Résidence Giacomo 2 allée du Niger 31000 TOULOUSE / FR | 03 /
Wuilque, Pascal 40 rue Pharaon 31000 TOULOUSE / FR | [2018/30] |
Former [2008/18] | 01 /
Niddam, David 19 rue du Médoc 31170, TOURNEFEUILLE / FR | ||
02 /
Delamotte, Luc Résidence Giacomo 2 allée du Niger 31000, TOULOUSE / FR | |||
03 /
Wuilque, Pascal 40 rue Pharaon 31000, TOULOUSE / FR | Representative(s) | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [2018/30] |
Former [2012/21] | 2SPL Patentanwälte Würmtalstraße 119 DE-81375 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/17] | Knecht, Ulrich Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Deutschland AG Intellectual Property & Standards Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/10] | Nicolle, Olivier, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2012/08] | Ameline, Jean-Paul B.C. Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 32 Avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2008/18] | Hedarchet, Stéphane Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07119074.8 | 23.10.2007 | [2008/18] | Priority number, date | FR20060054472 | 24.10.2006 Original published format: FR 0654472 | [2008/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1916819 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1916819 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
H04L69/04 (EP,US);
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04L69/161 (EP,US);
H04W28/06 (US);
H04L69/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/18] | H04L29/06, // H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2008/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kompressionsvorrichtung und entsprechende Dekompressionsvorrichtung | [2008/18] | English: | Compression device and associated decompression device | [2008/18] | French: | Dispositif de compression et dispositif de décompression associé | [2008/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 02.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2007 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | NL | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | PT | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | IE | 23.10.2018 | LU | 23.10.2018 | MT | 23.10.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | FR | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 23.10.2007 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
MT | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 23.10.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 23.10.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | |
NL | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 25.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0230043 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 12-20 * page 8 *; | [X] - CASNER S ET AL, "Compressing IP/UDP/RTP Headers for Low-Speed Serial Links", INTERNET CITATION, (199902), URL: ftp://ftp.isi.edu/in-notes/rfc2508.txt, (19991101), XP002121319 [X] 12-20 * sections 3.1 et 3.3 * | [A] - DEGERMARK M ET AL, "LOW-LOSS TCP/IP HEADER COMPRESSION FOR WIRELESS NETWORKS", WIRELESS NETWORKS, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199710), vol. 3, no. 5, ISSN 1022-0038, pages 375 - 387, XP000728935 [A] 1-11 * section 4.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1019138108114 |