Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] |
01.12.2009 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.10.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.05.2009 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.04.2009 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
23.01.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
07.01.2009 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
19.12.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] |
16.12.2008 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.09.2008 | First examination report | |
03.09.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
19.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant | |
11.04.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
11.04.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |