EP2052846 - Method of forming a T-shaped composite structure comprising a radius filler and radius filler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAAB AB 581 88 Linköping / SE | [2009/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petersson, Mikael Ullstämmavägen 122 589 51 Linköping / SE | 02 /
Hallander, Per Fanjunkaregatan 29 582 16 Linköping / SE | 03 /
Weidmann, Björn Vråkgatan 4 590 29 Borensberg / SE | [2013/49] |
Former [2009/18] | 01 /
Petersson, Mikael Ullstämmavägen 122 589 51 Linköping / SE | ||
02 /
Hallander, Per Kaptensgatan 19B 582 12 Linköping / SE | |||
03 /
Weidmann, Björn Vråkgatan 4 590 31 Borensberg / SE | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2013/50] | Norberg, Charlotte Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/18] | Norberg, Charlotte Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07119322.1 | 25.10.2007 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052846 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2052846 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B29D99/00, // B29C35/02 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
B29D99/0005 (EP,US);
B29C2791/001 (EP,US);
B29C35/0266 (EP,US);
Y10T428/197 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/18] | B29D31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer T-förmigen Verbundstruktur mit einem Füllmaterial und Radiusfüllmaterial | [2009/18] | English: | Method of forming a T-shaped composite structure comprising a radius filler and radius filler | [2009/18] | French: | Procédé fabrication d'une structure composite en forme de T comprenant un matériau de remplissage et matériau de remplissage | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2007 | AT | 11.12.2013 | BE | 11.12.2013 | BG | 11.12.2013 | CY | 11.12.2013 | CZ | 11.12.2013 | DK | 11.12.2013 | EE | 11.12.2013 | FI | 11.12.2013 | LT | 11.12.2013 | LV | 11.12.2013 | MC | 11.12.2013 | MT | 11.12.2013 | NL | 11.12.2013 | PL | 11.12.2013 | RO | 11.12.2013 | SE | 11.12.2013 | SI | 11.12.2013 | SK | 11.12.2013 | TR | 11.12.2013 | GR | 12.03.2014 | IS | 11.04.2014 | PT | 11.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 25.10.2007 | |
AT | 11.12.2013 | ||
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
TR | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
BG | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
IS | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
BE | 11.12.2013 | ||
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
LV | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
LT | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 11.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4151031 (GOAD ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 5, lines 21-60; figures 3,5,6; claims 1,5 *; | [A]US4219980 (LOYD MORRIS S [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 6; figures 1,5; claim 8 *; | [AX]US4559005 (GANTS WILBUR L [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 15; figures 1,2 * * column 4, lines 26-37 * [X] 10 | by applicant | US4559005 | US5650229 |