Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7758715 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2010 | B2 | US2009110836 | 30.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07119322 | 25.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2052846 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2013 | B1 | EP2052846 | 29.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07119322 | 25.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2443718T | 20.02.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07119322 | 25.10.2007 |