EP1916780 - Arrangement plus method to emulate a multi-path environment in a radio network arranged in or extended into an environment that is free of multi-path effects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hettstedt, Heinz-Deiter Seeadlerring 21 30916 Isernhagen / DE | 02 /
Kishnio, Yasuriho Kokusai Akasaka Bldg. 10F 4-5, Akasaka, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | 03 /
Osaka, Ken Kakusai Akasaka Bldg. 10F, 4-5 Alasaka, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | 04 /
Wang, Weili 5A Robinson Road Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Wetzel, Emmanuelle, et al Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property Business Group 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Wetzel, Emmanuelle, et al Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Intellectual Property Group Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/18] | Wetzel, Emmanuelle, et al Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Intellectual Property & Standards Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07119326.2 | 25.10.2007 | [2008/18] | Priority number, date | DE20061050179 | 25.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006050179 | [2008/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1916780 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1916780 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/711, H04B7/06, H04B7/08, H04B7/26, H04W16/26 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
H04B7/0671 (EP);
H04B7/084 (EP);
H04B7/0894 (EP);
H04B7/15507 (EP);
H04B1/7115 (EP);
H04B7/145 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/18] | H04B7/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Emulierung einer Mehrwegumgebung in einem Funknetz, das sich in einer mehrwegeffektfreien Umgebung befindet oder in diese hineinreicht | [2008/18] | English: | Arrangement plus method to emulate a multi-path environment in a radio network arranged in or extended into an environment that is free of multi-path effects | [2008/18] | French: | Agencement et procédé pour émuler un environnement par trajets multiples dans un réseau radio agencé ou étendu dans un environnement sans effets de trajets multiples | [2008/18] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/22] | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 10.04.2013 | [2013/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5652765 (ADACHI FUMIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * figure 2 * * column 2, lines 20-28 * * column 2, lines 45-49 * * column 6 * * column 8, lines 1-14 * * claims 2-4 *; | [A]WO9944308 (REPEATER TECHNOLOGIES [US], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract * |