Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
11.12.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] |
10.12.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.12.2009 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.04.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |