EP2056425 - System and method for transmitting data of different priorities through a hollow transmission device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deck, Bernhard Scheueräcker 5 798 09, Weilheim / DE | 02 /
Landernäs, Krister Engelbrektsgatan 14 C 722 16, Västerås / SE | 03 /
Kjellsson, Jimmy Klockartorpsgatan 25 D 723 44, Västerås / SE | 04 /
Ebbinghaus, Werner D Kanonenstrasse 10 457 31, Waltrop / DE | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Reyier, Ann-Mari, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Box 128 721 05 Västerås / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Reyier, Ann-Mari, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Box 128 721 05 Västeras / SE | Application number, filing date | 07119421.1 | 26.10.2007 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2056425 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00, H04B3/52, H04W72/02 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
H04B3/52 (EP,US);
H02J13/00002 (EP,US);
H02J13/00017 (EP,US);
H02J13/00022 (EP,US);
H02J13/00034 (EP,US);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/02] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Übertragung von Daten unterschiedlicher Prioritäten durch eine hohle Übertragungsvorrichtung | [2009/19] | English: | System and method for transmitting data of different priorities through a hollow transmission device | [2009/19] | French: | Système et procédé de transmission de données de priorités diverses dans un dispositif de transmission creux | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/20] | 16.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1134943 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [DY]EP1239600 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [DY] 1-17 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0031] *; | [Y]US2003079023 (STEFANSSON THORARINN [IS], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraphs [0014] , [0018]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2005058147 (REGNIER GREG J [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A] - MARK J KAROL ET AL, "Time-Frequency-Code Slicing: Efficiently Allocating the Communications Spectrum to Multirate Users", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199711), vol. 46, no. 4, ISSN 0018-9545, XP011063628 |