EP1958752 - Method of indicating an open/close state of a check valve of an injection molding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC CORPORATION 3580 Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2011/08] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchiyama, Tatsuhiro c/o FANUC Corporation 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | 02 /
Takatsugi, Satoshi c/o FANUC Corporation 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | 03 /
Saito, Osamu c/o FANUC Corporation 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | 04 /
Maruyama, Junpei c/o FANUC Corporation 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2012/42] |
Former [2012/37] | 01 /
Uchiyama, Tatsuhiro c/o FANUC LTD, 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | ||
02 /
Takatsugi, Satoshi c/o FANUC LTD, 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | |||
03 /
Saito, Osamu c/o FANUC LTD, 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | |||
04 /
Maruyama, Junpei c/o FANUC LTD, 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | |||
Former [2008/34] | 01 /
Uchiyama, Tatsuhiro c/o FANUC LTD, 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba, Oshin Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | ||
02 /
Takatsugi, Satoshi c/o FANUC LTD, 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba, Oshin Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | |||
03 /
Saito, Osamu c/o FANUC LTD, 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba, Oshin Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | |||
04 /
Maruyama, Junpei c/o FANUC LTD, 3580, Shibokusa Aza-komanba, Oshin Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07119509.3 | 29.10.2007 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | JP20070034886 | 15.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007034886 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1958752 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1958752 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/52, B29C45/76 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
B29C45/52 (EP,US);
B29C45/76 (EP,US);
B29C2045/7606 (EP,US);
B29C2945/7602 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76187 (EP,US);
B29C2945/76401 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2009/18] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anzeige eines geöffneten/geschlossenen Zustandes einer Rückströmsperre einer Spritzgießmaschine | [2008/34] | English: | Method of indicating an open/close state of a check valve of an injection molding machine | [2008/34] | French: | Procédé pour indiquer un état ouvert/fermé d'un clapet de retenue d'une machine de moulage par injection | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 25.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0349649 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * page 2, line 28 - page 9, line 1; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP1439047 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0024] - [0061]; figures 1-11 *; | [Y]US2004139810 (SAITO OSAMU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * paragraphs [0018] , [0076] , [0085]; figures 5,8 *; | [Y]JP2006247874 (NISSEI PLASTICS IND CO) [Y] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US2006278014 (OKADA HARUO [JP], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0034] - [0041]; figures 4,5 * | by applicant | EP0349649 | US2004139810 | JP2004216808 | JP2006247874 |