EP1918126 - Wheel having hubcap clamp mounted to improve wheel balance and method of balancing a wheel using a hubcap clamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [2013/17] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states Honeywell International, Inc. Law Dept. AB/2B, 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parker, Charles A. 52199 Arrowhead Circle Granger, IN 46530 / US | 02 /
Spray, Matthew D. / 1519 Rockne Drive South Bend, IN 46617 / US | 03 /
McAfee, David D. 459 Leet Road Niles, MI 49120 / US | 04 /
Haynes, Andrew S. 56340 Willow Road New Carlisle, IN 46552 / US | 05 /
Auel, Todd R. 10616 Red Pine Drive Granger, IN 46530 / US | 06 /
Hodge, Steve 52725 Ironwood South Bend, IN 46635 / US | [2013/17] |
Former [2008/19] | 01 /
Parker, Charles A. 52199 Arrowhead Circle Granger, IN 46530 / US | ||
02 /
Spray, Matthew D. 1519 Rockne Drive South Bend, IN 46617 / US | |||
03 /
McAfee, David D. 459 Leet Road Niles, MI 49120 / US | |||
04 /
Haynes, Andrew S. 56340 Willow Road New Carlisle, IN 46552 / US | |||
05 /
Auel, Todd R. 10616 Red Pine Drive Granger, IN 46530 / US | |||
06 /
Hodge, Steve 52725 Ironwood South Bend, IN 46635 / US | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2008/19] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell GB-Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07119556.4 | 29.10.2007 | [2008/19] | Priority number, date | US20060589191 | 30.10.2006 Original published format: US 589191 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1918126 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1918126 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | [2010/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1918126 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60B7/00, B64C25/36 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
B60B7/14 (EP,US);
B60B7/0013 (EP,US);
B60B7/0066 (EP,US);
B60B7/066 (EP,US);
B64C25/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/19] | B60B7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/06] |
Former [2008/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rad mit montierter Radkappenklammer für verbesserte Auswuchtung und Verfahren zur Auswuchtung mittels Radkappenklammer | [2008/19] | English: | Wheel having hubcap clamp mounted to improve wheel balance and method of balancing a wheel using a hubcap clamp | [2008/19] | French: | Roue dotée d'une pince d'enjoliveur pour améliorer l'équilibrage des roues et procédé pour équilibrer une roue à l'aide d'une pince d'enjoliveur | [2008/19] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 21.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.01.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2159881 (BOOTH WILLIAM N) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 17; figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE3611038 (INT TECHNICAL RESEARCH S A H [LU]) [A] 1,8,10 * figures 4a,4b *; | [A]JPH031802U (NN) [A] 1,8,10 * figures 1-3,6,7 *; | [A]US6152537 (WRIGHT JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 43; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US6378954 (POLKA JOHN G [US]) [A] 1-10* column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 15; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | DE3611038 |