EP1878668 - Scored package and a method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PECHINEY EMBALLAGE FLEXIBLE EUROPE 1, rue de l'Union 92843 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hodson, Jay, D. W7346 Westhaven Drive Greenville, WI 54442 / US | 02 /
Buelow, Duane, H. 5268 Ah May Tah Road Oshkosh, WI 54901 / US | 03 /
Perre, Chad, M. N3214 Hickory Drive Waupun, WI 53963 / US | [2009/12] |
Former [2008/03] | 01 /
Hodson, Jay, D. W7346 Westhaven Drive Greenville, WI 54442 / US | ||
02 /
Buelow, Duane, H. 5268 Ah May Tah Road Oshkosh, WI 54901 / US | |||
03 /
Perre, Chad, M. N3214 Hickory Drive Waupin, WI 53963 / US | Representative(s) | Hill, Justin John McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Hill, Justin John McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07119912.9 | 20.12.2002 | [2008/03] | Priority number, date | US20010034886 | 28.12.2001 Original published format: US 34886 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1878668 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/24, B65B61/18, B31B1/90 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
B65D75/5805 (EP,US);
B65D33/2508 (EP,US);
B65D33/2533 (EP,US);
B31B70/8132 (EP,US);
Y10T428/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Title | German: | Gekerbte Verpackung und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2008/03] | English: | Scored package and a method of making same | [2008/03] | French: | Paquet rayé et son procédé de fabrication | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 04.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 20.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02794389.3 / EP1467919 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0410126 (MINIGRIP INC [US]) [Y] 29 * figure 6; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5713669 (THOMAS TOBY R [US], et al) [Y] 10-27 * column 3, line 33 - line 54; figure 3 *; | [XY]US2001017947 (STRAND AARON [US], et al) [X] 1-9,19-28,30 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0118]; figures 5,39 * [Y] 10-27,29; | [X]EP1142500 (REYNOLDS CONSUMER PROD [US]) [X] 1-3,5-9,19-21,23-28,30 * figures 11-13 *; | [E]WO03018417 (PLIANT CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-3,5-12,14-18 * page 8, line 20 - line 22 * * page 16, line 23 - page 17, line 4 * * page 24, line 1 - line 5 ** figures 7,20,21b,32 * |