Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7765809 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2010 | B2 | US2008110174 | 15.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55863606 | 10.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5252882B | Global Dossier | 31.07.2013 | B2 | JP2008122066 | 29.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US55863606 | 10.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1921383 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2013 | A3 | EP1921383 | 14.05.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US55863606 | 10.11.2006 |