EP1921900 - Illumination device with a light source and a touch actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/20] | Illumination device with a light source and a sensor device | ||
[2012/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6 80807 München / DE | [2013/16] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states OSRAM AG Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siegmund, Thomas Jupiterstr. 3a 83624, Otterfing / DE | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/19] |
Former [2008/20] | Raiser, Franz Osram GmbH Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07120129.7 | 07.11.2007 | [2008/20] | Priority number, date | DE20061052949 | 09.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006052949 | [2008/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1921900 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1921900 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1921900 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
H05B47/10 (EP,US);
H01L27/0251 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung mit einer Lichtquelle und einer Tastvorrichtung | [2008/20] | English: | Illumination device with a light source and a touch actuator | [2012/06] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage doté d'une source lumineuse et d'un interrupteur à effleurement | [2012/06] |
Former [2008/20] | Illumination device with a light source and a sensor device | ||
Former [2008/20] | Dispositif d'éclairage doté d'une source lumineuse et d'un dispositif capteur | Examination procedure | 09.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 26.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2007 | CY | 01.08.2012 | CZ | 01.08.2012 | DK | 01.08.2012 | EE | 01.08.2012 | FI | 01.08.2012 | IT | 01.08.2012 | LT | 01.08.2012 | LV | 01.08.2012 | MT | 01.08.2012 | NL | 01.08.2012 | RO | 01.08.2012 | SE | 01.08.2012 | SI | 01.08.2012 | SK | 01.08.2012 | TR | 01.08.2012 | BG | 01.11.2012 | GR | 02.11.2012 | GB | 07.11.2012 | IE | 07.11.2012 | LU | 07.11.2012 | ES | 12.11.2012 | AT | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | IS | 01.12.2012 | PT | 03.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
TR | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
GB | 07.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.11.2012 | ||
LU | 07.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
TR | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
GB | 07.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
GB | 07.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
GB | 07.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 01.08.2012 | |
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 01.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0533336 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]US5825603 (PARAT KRISHNA [US], et al) [A] 1,8* column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 15 *; | [A]US2004109270 (STOCKINGER MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0077805 | US6323445 | US6472286 | US6560081 | US2003197246 | US2005269641 | US6977420 | WO2006033993 | EP20060010545 |