Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1925380T | 31.12.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07120206 | 07.11.2007 | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1925380T | 31.12.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07120206 | 07.11.2007 | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7913532 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2011 | B2 | US2008121010 | 29.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101536746B | Global Dossier | 14.07.2015 | B1 | KR20080047277 | 28.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5550807B | Global Dossier | 16.07.2014 | B2 | JP2008126404 | 05.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007234559B | Global Dossier | 24.10.2013 | B2 | AU2007234559 | 12.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1925380 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2010 | B1 | EP1925380 | 28.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE473815T | 15.07.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0704174 | 06.11.2018 | B1 | BRPI0704174 | 08.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2610323 | 13.01.2015 | C | CA2610323 | 23.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101200040B | 07.03.2012 | B | CN101200040 | 18.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602007007711D1 | 26.08.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1925380T | 27.09.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2348749T | 13.12.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITMI20062240 | 24.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007014676 | 12.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY152521 | 15.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1925380E | 16.09.2010 | E | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2443544 | 27.02.2012 | C2 | RU2007143385 | 10.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI391189B | 01.04.2013 | B | TW200831209 | 01.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI20062240 | 23.11.2006 |