EP1925380 - Machine with a manipulator for metal sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/22] | Manipulator for metal sheets | ||
[2010/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SALVAGNINI ITALIA S.p.A. Via Ing. Guido Salvagnini, 1 36040 Sarego (VI) / IT | [2008/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Battheu, Claude Via Villani 6 A 39015, Schio (VI) / IT | 02 /
Venturini, Gianfranco Via Predicale 66E 37044, Cologna Veneta (VR) / IT | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Mittler, Enrico Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07120206.3 | 07.11.2007 | [2008/22] | Priority number, date | IT2006MI02240 | 23.11.2006 Original published format: IT MI20062240 | [2008/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925380 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1925380 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B21D43/11 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
B21D43/11 (EP,US);
B23Q5/48 (KR);
B21D28/265 (EP,US);
B23D27/00 (KR);
B23K26/10 (KR);
B23Q5/54 (KR);
B23Q7/00 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/22] | Extension states | HR | 25.11.2008 | RS | 25.11.2008 | Title | German: | Maschine mit einem Manipulator für Metallbleche | [2010/03] | English: | Machine with a manipulator for metal sheets | [2010/03] | French: | Machine avec un manipulateur pour tôles | [2010/03] |
Former [2008/22] | Manipulator für Metallbleche | ||
Former [2008/22] | Manipulator for metal sheets | ||
Former [2008/22] | Manipulateur pour tôles | Examination procedure | 25.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.07.2010 | EE | 14.07.2010 | LT | 14.07.2010 | LV | 14.07.2010 | MT | 14.07.2010 | RO | 14.07.2010 | SK | 14.07.2010 | BG | 14.10.2010 | LU | 07.11.2010 | IS | 14.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | HU | 15.01.2011 | [2013/14] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
IT | 07.11.2010 | ||
LU | 07.11.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
IT | 07.11.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
MT | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
IT | 07.11.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
IT | 07.11.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 14.07.2010 | |
LT | 14.07.2010 | ||
LV | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
IS | 14.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4023788 (HERB EUGEN, et al) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 *; | [X]US4274801 (HERB EUGEN, et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 1,3-6 *; | [X]EP0123183 (TRUMPF GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5701791 (SCHULZE ECKEHART [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1447156 (SALVAGNINI ITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3* the whole document * | by applicant | EP0123183 |