Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
09.07.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.04.2012 | Change - representative | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] |
30.12.2011 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.11.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.11.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.03.2009 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
19.12.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] |
16.12.2008 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
25.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant | |
14.11.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
11.04.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |