EP1921577 - Social networking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 430-8650 / JP | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyazaki, Takuma c/o Yamaha Business Support Corporation 11F, Act Tower, 111-2, Itayamachi, Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken, 430-7711 / JP | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Ascherl, Andreas, et al KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Ascherl, Andreas, et al Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | Kehl, Günther, et al Kehl & Ettmayr Patentanwälte, Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07120319.4 | 09.11.2007 | [2008/20] | Priority number, date | JP20060306012 | 10.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006306012 | JP20070049221 | 28.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007049221 | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1921577 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, H04L29/06 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
H04L63/104 (EP,US);
G06F16/1837 (EP,US);
G06F16/68 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2009/04] |
Former [2008/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Soziales Vernetzungssystem | [2008/20] | English: | Social networking system | [2008/20] | French: | Système de réseautage social | [2008/20] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 15.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 09.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005197846 (PEZARIS PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [X]WO2006104706 (GOOGLE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0013] , [0020] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0024] , [0034] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0049] * * figures 1,4 *; | [PX]WO2007127644 (YAHOO INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-16 * page 10, line 17 - page 11, line 3 * * page 17, lines 6-13 * * page 20, line 24 - page 22, line 20 * * figures 1,3,5 * | by applicant | WO2006104706 |