EP1926250 - Methods and a device for secure distance calculation in communicatio networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/50] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing, Inc. 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Durand, Alain 79, rue de Dinan 35000, RENNES / FR | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Berthier, Karine THOMSON European Patent Operations 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Berthier, Karine THOMSON, European Patent Operations, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07120532.2 | 13.11.2007 | [2008/22] | Priority number, date | EP20060301192 | 26.11.2006 Original published format: EP 06301192 | [2008/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1926250 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1926250 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L29/06 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
H04L69/16 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/0492 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/0864 (KR);
H04L43/50 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/18 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/06] |
Former [2008/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur sicheren Entfernungsberechnung in Kommunikationsnetzen | [2008/22] | English: | Methods and a device for secure distance calculation in communicatio networks | [2008/22] | French: | Procédés et dispositif pour le calcul de la distance de sécurité dans des réseaux de communication | [2008/22] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 29.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0203653 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, line 14 - line 21 * * page 5, line 8 - line 23 * * figure 7 * * page 9, line 9 - line 20 ** page 12, line 24 - page 14, line 2 *; | [X]US2003110274 (PAZI GUY [IL], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 3 * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0068] *; | [X]US2003110276 (RIDDLE GUY [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 5 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * figure 6 * * paragraph [0047] * |