EP1915893 - Function management system for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Falck, Peter L 2613 Saratoga Drive Waterloo, IA 50702 / US | 02 /
Goodnight, Trend L 106 Carmela Drive Hudson, IA 50643 / US | 03 /
Kittle, Carl E 2312 Primrose Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US | 04 /
Lang, Stephen P 28075 110th Street New Hartford, IA 50660 / US | 05 /
Newendorp, Bruce C 211 Sandahlwood Circle Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US | 06 /
Youngblood, Michael O 409 Chateau Court Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US | [2016/08] |
Former [2008/18] | 01 /
Falck, Peter L 2613 Saratoga Drive Waterloo, IA 50702 / US | ||
02 /
Goodnight, Trend L 106 Carmela Drive Hudson, IA 50643 / US | |||
03 /
Kittle, Carl E 2312 Primrose Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US | |||
04 /
Lang, Stephen P 28075 110th Street New Hartford, IA 50660 / US | |||
05 /
Newendorp, Bruce C 211 Sandahlwood Circle Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US | |||
06 /
Youngblood, Michael O 409 Chateau Court Cedar Falls, IA 50613 / US | Representative(s) | Bradl, Joachim John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2016/08] |
Former [2008/18] | Bradl, Joachim Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07120790.6 | 07.04.2000 | [2008/18] | Priority number, date | US19990291080 | 14.04.1999 Original published format: US 291080 | [2008/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1915893 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1915893 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01B63/111 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
E02F9/20 (EP,US);
A01B63/00 (EP,US);
A01B63/1117 (EP,US);
E02F9/26 (EP,US);
G05B2219/23423 (EP,US);
G05B2219/2663 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/18] | A01B63/00, B62D49/00, E02F9/20, G05B15/02, G05B19/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT [2016/08] |
Former [2008/18] | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Funktionsmanagementsystem für Fahrzeuge | [2008/18] | English: | Function management system for vehicles | [2008/18] | French: | Système de gestion de fonction pour véhicules | [2015/41] |
Former [2008/18] | Système de gestion de la fonction pour vehicules | Examination procedure | 30.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 12.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00107566.2 / EP1044591 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000107566) is 11.08.2005 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | IT | 24.02.2016 | [2016/36] |
Former [2016/35] | ES | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4628454 (ITO KATSUMI [JP]) [A] * abstract *; | [X]US5050771 (HANSON LOWELL D [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 3 - column 5, line 45; figures 1,5 *; | [A]EP0448716 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 33 *; | [A]US5359517 (MORIYA YUKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 17 *; | [A]GB2279774 (SAMSUNG HEAVY IND [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0838141 (NEW HOLLAND UK LTD [GB]) [A] * abstract *; | [X]FR2764401 (RENAULT AGRICULTURE [FR]) [X] 1-12 * page 1, line 1 - page 10, line 10; figures 1,2 * |